This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 09:51:30 (UTC).

Keena v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Keena filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alice R. Senechal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alice R. Senechal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Keena

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McLain J. Schneider

Attorney at Schneider, Schneider & Schneider

815 3Rd Ave. S.

Fargo, ND 58103

Defendant Attorney

Sarah E. Wall

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 699

Bismarck, ND 58502

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Schneider, McLain) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Scott Keena. (js) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (js) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Scott Keena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Scott Keena. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/1/2020. (sj) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Scott Keena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Civil Cover Sheet)(sj) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McLain J. Schneider