This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:03:27 (UTC).

KEEN v. MONSANTO COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 KEEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MONSANTO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07856

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORACE CLARK KEEN

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Walker Garrett

Attorney at The Finley Firm, P.C.

200 13Th Street

Columbus, GA 31901

Defendant Attorney

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

7 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

Summons

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HORACE CLARK KEEN (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00147. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MONSANTO COMPANY (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings to the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (mdm) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HORACE CLARK KEEN as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (GARRETT, R) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3251060, $400 filed by HORACE CLARK KEEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GARRETT, R) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Middle District of Georgia, 19-00147 Keen, opened in California Northern District as 19-07856 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 161 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00147. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of California. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/7/2019. (mdm) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings to the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (mdm) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HORACE CLARK KEEN as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (GARRETT, R) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HORACE CLARK KEEN (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by MONSANTO COMPANY ); Case Administrator Deficiency. (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MONSANTO COMPANY (mdm) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3251060, $400 filed by HORACE CLARK KEEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GARRETT, R) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less