Keech v. Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Scott Keech; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17917514. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bellows, Laurel) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Scott Keech, Scai Holdings, LLC by Laurel G. Bellows (Bellows, Laurel) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17921973. (Harvey, Dean) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17922121. (Chan, Lin) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17922179. (Salahi, Yaman) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scott Keech by Anthony Paronich (Paronich, Anthony) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 , #4 , and #5 are granted. Telephonic initial status conference set for 4/7/2021 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17934029. (Desai, Nimish) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17934164. (Lamy, Michelle) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17934209. (Moldovan, Jessica) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 , #9 , and #10 are granted. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Scott Keech. Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Harvey, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Scott Keech. Scai Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Harvey, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation Setting Deadlines for Defendants to Answer (Laytin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scai Holdings, LLC, Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC by Daniel E. Laytin (Laytin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scai Holdings, LLC, Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC by James H. Mutchnik (Mutchnik, James) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Scai Holdings, LLC, Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC by Catie Ventura (Ventura, Catie) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scott Keech by Laurel G. Bellows Nicholas J. Economakos (Bellows, Laurel) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scott Keech by Nicholas James Economakos (Economakos, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scott Keech by Nicholas James Economakos (Economakos, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation Setting Deadlines (Laytin, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 11:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Telephonic status hearing set for 4/7/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 3/25/2021. All proceedings are stayed pending resolution of the United States' motion to intervene and stay civil proceedings at docket number 30 in 1:21-cv-00305, Roe v. Surgical Care Affiliates. The Court adopts the parties' schedule set forth in their agreed stipulation setting deadlines: Defendants will answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 5/3/2021; if the response is by motion, Plaintiff's opposition will be due 6/17/2021; and Defendants' reply will be due 7/19/2021. In the event this action is consolidated with another matter and Plaintiff files a consolidated amended complaint, the deadlines will be stricken and replaced with the following deadlines: Defendants will answer or otherwise respond no later than 45 days after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint; if the response is by motion, Plaintiff's opposition will be due 45 days thereafter; and Defendants' reply will be due 30 days thereafter. Telephonic status hearing set for 5/6/2021 at 11:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less