This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 09:07:24 (UTC).

Kearney v. Western Carolina University et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Kearney filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Western Carolina University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Kearney

Defendants

Western Carolina University

University of North Carolina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Wall

Attorney at Higgins Benjamin, PLLC

301 N. Elm Street, Suite 800

Greensboro, NC 27401

Thomas A. Newkirk

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman, P.L.C.

521 E. Locust Street, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Danya Keller

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman, P.L.C.

521 E. Locust Street, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Western Carolina University, University of North Carolina. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Thomas A. Newkirk for Heather Kearney. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/28/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Danya Keller for Heather Kearney. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/28/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas A. Newkirk Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4472666. by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wall, Jonathan). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 04/25/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Danya Keller Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4472574. by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Wall, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Contract

1 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC RTS Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4472559), filed by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC RTS Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Contract)(Wall, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Western Carolina University, University of North Carolina. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Thoms A. Newkirk: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/5/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Thomas A. Newkirk for Heather Kearney. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/28/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice to Attorney Danya Keller: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/5/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Danya Keller for Heather Kearney. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/28/2020. (ejb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas A. Newkirk Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4472666. by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wall, Jonathan). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 04/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motion referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Danya Keller, Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4472574. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Danya Keller Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4472574. by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Wall, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4472559), filed by Heather Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC RTS Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Contract)(Wall, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less