This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:29:22 (UTC).

KEARINS v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 KEARINS filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against MONSANTO COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne E. Thompson and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21365

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne E. Thompson

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL F. KEARINS

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

MONSANTO COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN MILUN

Attorney at THE KILLIAN FIRM PC

555 Route 1 South, Suite 430

Iselin, NJ 08830

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-177) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10179556) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL F. KEARINS.(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from New Jersey has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-00209, filed 01/10/2020. (dm ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-177) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketJudge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10179556) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL F. KEARINS.(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.