This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:13:54 (UTC).

KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. v. International Restaurant Management Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 KCP Food U S , Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against International Restaurant Management Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00481

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.

Defendants

International Restaurant Management Group, Inc.

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen Ann Doner

Attorney at Doner Law, PLC

1750 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 1500

Tysons Corner, VA 22102

Mark J Rosenberg

Attorney at Tarter Krinsky and Drogin KKP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for KCP Food (U.S.), Inc..(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

3 #2

Exhibit A - Declaration of Tony Chiu

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark J. Rosenberg (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9786887.) by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to International Restaurant Management Group, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#7

(#7) QC NOTICE: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#8

(#8) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark J. Rosenberg by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. (Doner, Karen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #10 Plaintiff's notice of dismissal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/29/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. (Doner, Karen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark J Rosenberg. Directing attorney Mark J Rosenberg to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark J. Rosenberg by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) QC NOTICE: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketTelephone Conference held on 3/2/2022 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a telephone conference with counsel on Wednesday, March 2, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel (c/e/m to Messrs. London and Rosenberg 3/1/22 sat). (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to International Restaurant Management Group, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark J. Rosenberg (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9786887.) by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tony Chiu, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for KCP Food (U.S.), Inc..(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KCP Food (U.S.), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9785536.), filed by KCP Food (U.S.), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Jon Rosenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Ann Doner