This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:35:11 (UTC).

KB Home et al v. Illinois Union Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 KB Home filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Illinois Union Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00278

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc.

KB Home South Bay Inc.

KB Home

KB Home Coastal Inc.

Defendants

Illinois Union Insurance Company

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacquelyn Mohr

Attorney at Newmeyer and Dillon LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Alan H Packer

Attorney at Newmeyer and Dillion LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Gregory Lee Dillion

Attorney at Newmeyer and Dillion LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Brandon A Clouse

Attorney at Newmeyer and Dillion LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor, 949-854-700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Graham C Mills

Attorney at Newmeyer and Dillion LLP

1333 North California Boulevard Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan R Gross

Attorney at Mound Cotton Woolan and Greengrass LLP

2200 Powell Street Suite 1050

Emeryville, CA 94608

Bao Hien Natalie Vu

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wolland Greengrass LLP

2200 Powell Street, Suite 1050

Emeryville, CA 94608

Lawrence Hecimovich

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wollen and Greengrass LLP

2200 Powell Street Suite 1050

Emerville, CA 94608

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bao Hien Natalie Vu counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Bao Hien Natalie Vu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Vu, Bao Hien) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lawrence Hecimovich counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Adding Lawrence Hecimovich as counsel of record for Illinois Union Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attorney Lawrence Hecimovich added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hecimovich, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Graham C Mills counsel for Plaintiffs KB Home, KB Home Coastal Inc., KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home South Bay Inc.. Jacquelyn M. Mohr is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff KB Home; KB Home Coastal, Inc.; KB Home Los Angeles, Inc.; KB Home South Bay, Inc.. (Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home Coastal Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home South Bay Inc.(pty:pla))(Mills, Graham) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 9, 2021. (tg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#13

(#13) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 4/3/2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#11

(#11) STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiffs KB Home, KB Home Coastal Inc., KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home South Bay Inc. (Clouse, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying KB Home; KB Home Coastal, Inc.; KB Home Greater Los Angeles, Inc.; KB Home South Bay, Inc.. (Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home Coastal Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home South Bay Inc.(pty:pla))(Clouse, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A-H in support

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:20-cv-278 JLS (JDEx). (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company identifying Pacific Employers Insurance Company, ACE American Insurance Company, INA Holdings Corporation, INA Financial Corporation, INA Corporation, Chubb INA Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit Notice & Acknowledgement and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01112931 Receipt No: 0973-25294070 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice & Acknowledgement and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Bao Hein Natalie Vu added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bao Hien Natalie Vu counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Bao Hien Natalie Vu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Vu, Bao Hien) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lawrence Hecimovich counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Adding Lawrence Hecimovich as counsel of record for Illinois Union Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attorney Lawrence Hecimovich added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hecimovich, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Graham C Mills counsel for Plaintiffs KB Home, KB Home Coastal Inc., KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home South Bay Inc.. Jacquelyn M. Mohr is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff KB Home; KB Home Coastal, Inc.; KB Home Los Angeles, Inc.; KB Home South Bay, Inc.. (Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home Coastal Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Graham C Mills added to party KB Home South Bay Inc.(pty:pla))(Mills, Graham) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 9, 2021. (tg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 4/3/2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiffs KB Home, KB Home Coastal Inc., KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home South Bay Inc. (Clouse, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying KB Home; KB Home Coastal, Inc.; KB Home Greater Los Angeles, Inc.; KB Home South Bay, Inc.. (Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home Coastal Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon A Clouse added to party KB Home South Bay Inc.(pty:pla))(Clouse, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company, OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H in support)(Vu, Bao Hien) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 4/3/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:20-cv-278 JLS (JDEx). (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/6/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff KB Home South Bay Inc., KB Home, KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home Coastal Inc., upon Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by By Natalie Vu, on behalf of Illinois Union Ins. Co., Attorney for defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Illinois Union Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs KB Home South Bay Inc., KB Home, KB Home Greater Los Angeles Inc., KB Home Coastal Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company identifying Pacific Employers Insurance Company, ACE American Insurance Company, INA Holdings Corporation, INA Financial Corporation, INA Corporation, Chubb INA Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01112931 Receipt No: 0973-25294070 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice & Acknowledgement and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Bao Hein Natalie Vu added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Vu, Bao Hein) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME SOUTH BAY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME COASTAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KB HOME is a litigant