This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2021 at 18:44:17 (UTC).

Kazmierczak v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Kazmierczak filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Investigations. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aileen M. Cannon and Shaniek M. Maynard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-14092

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

Referral Judge

Shaniek M. Maynard

 

Party Details

Defendants

Dr. Benjamin

Environmental Protection Agency

Atlanta Journal Constitution

ABC

U.S. Department of Justice

Rick Scott

Mayo Clinic

Chicago Tribune

Brendan Carr

Rachael Beam

Walgreens Pharmacy

J & L Consulting

Old Orchid HOA

Pam Bondi

Federal Bureau of Investigations

CNN

commercial advertisers

Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg

CBS

Metro PCS Metro

96 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER of Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Jacek Kazmierczak. Responses due by 3/22/2021. (jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#11

(#11) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1st Fire and Security, 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Albandian, Apple, Richard Atkinson, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Rachael Beam, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Brendan Carr, Charter Communications, Chicago Suntimes, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Mignon Clyburn, Comcast Corporation, Annemarie Craft, Ron Desantis, Donohoe, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Benjamin, Dr. Coppola, Dr. Creelman, Dr. Dimberg, Dr. Huszar, Dr. Kalish, Dr. Moss, Dr. Ramos, Dr. Yergen, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Federal Communications Commission, Federal Department of Health, Florida Bar, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox, Fox News, Frank at UF, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Globe, Goldman Sachs, Google, Richard Gripenberg, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Taher Husainey, Indian River County, Indian River County Mosquito Control, Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Indian River Press Journal, J & L Consulting, Jill, Jim, Kim Jones, Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, MSNBC, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Charles W. McKinnon, Mcafee, Mckinnon & Hamilton PLLC, Metro PCS Metro, Microsoft, Minnesota Star Tribune, NBC, New York Times, Timothy Noonan, Norton Antivirus, Mike O'rielly, Old Orchid HOA, Old Orchid Residents, Orlando Sentinel, Ajit Pai, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Potts, Quality Health Care, Jessica Rosenworcel, Christine Ross, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Lindsay N. Shroyer, Arlene Smilov, State of Florida, Suntimes, The Boston Globe, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Justice, USA Today, Ed Uttrich, Van Devoorde Hall Law, Verizon, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Andrew Wheeler, William Wilhelm, Christopher Wray, YouTube, Albert Zolezzi, commercial advertisers, lndlan River County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak.(jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Apple, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Charter Communications, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Ron Desantis, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Huszar, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox News, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Goldman Sachs, Google, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Indian River County Mosquito Control, J & L Consulting, Kim Jones, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Mcafee, Microsoft, NBC, New York Times, Norton Antivirus, Orlando Sentinel, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Quality Health Care, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Arlene Smilov, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, USA Today, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Christopher Wray, Youtube, Albert Zolezzi. (kpe) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/1/2021) (kpe). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/1/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS200002671. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to #4 Order, by Jacek Kazmierczak. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

5 #1

Amended Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1st Fire and Security, 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Apple, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Rachael Beam, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Brendan Carr, Charter Communications, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Mignon Clyburn, Comcast, Ron Desantis, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Benjamin, Dr. Coppola, Dr. Creelman, Dr. Dimberg, Dr. Hussainy, Dr. Huszar, Dr. Kalish, Dr. Moss, Dr. Ramos, Dr. Shroyer, Dr. Yergen, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Federal Communications Commission, Federal Department of Health, Florida Bar, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox, Fox News, Frank at UF, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Globe, Goldman Sachs, Google, Richard Gripenberg, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Indian River County, Indian River County Mosquito Control, J & L Consulting, Jill, Jim, Kim Jones, Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, MSNBC, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Mcafee, Mckinnon & Hamilton PLLC, Metro PCS Metro, Microsoft, Minnesota Tribune, NBC, New York Times, Timothy Noonan, Norton Antivirus, Mike O'rielly, Old Orchid HOA, Old Orchid Residents, Orlando Sentinel, Ajit Pai, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Quality Health Care, Jessica Rosenworcel, Christine Ross, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Arlene Smilov, State of Florida, Suntimes, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Justice, USA Today, Ed Uttrich, Van Devoorde Hall Law, Verizon, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Andrew Wheeler, William Wilhelm and Annemarie Craft, Bar Counsel, Christopher Wray, Youtube, Albert Zolezzi, commercial advertisers, lndlan River County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacek Kazmierczak. (ebz) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Subpoenas

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Subpoenas, #3 Summon(s))(ebz) Modified date filed on 2/18/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Verizon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kpe) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER of Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Verizon Board Of Directors not a party on Second Amended Complaint. (jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to 1st Fire and Security, Albandian, Richard Atkinson, Rachael Beam, Brendan Carr, Chicago Suntimes, Mignon Clyburn, Comcast Corporation, Dr. Coppola, Dr. Creelman, Dr. Kalish, Dr. Moss, Dr. Ramos, Dr. Yergen, Taher Husainey, Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg, Charles W. McKinnon, Minnesota Star Tribune, Mike O'Reilly, Ajit Pai, Jessica Rosenworcel, Christine Ross, Lindsay N. Shroyer, The Boston Globe, Ed Uttrich. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons)(jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Jacek Kazmierczak. Responses due by 3/22/2021. (jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1st Fire and Security, 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Albandian, Apple, Richard Atkinson, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Rachael Beam, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Brendan Carr, Charter Communications, Chicago Suntimes, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Mignon Clyburn, Comcast Corporation, Annemarie Craft, Ron Desantis, Donohoe, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Benjamin, Dr. Coppola, Dr. Creelman, Dr. Dimberg, Dr. Huszar, Dr. Kalish, Dr. Moss, Dr. Ramos, Dr. Yergen, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Federal Communications Commission, Federal Department of Health, Florida Bar, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox, Fox News, Frank at UF, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Globe, Goldman Sachs, Google, Richard Gripenberg, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Taher Husainey, Indian River County, Indian River County Mosquito Control, Indian River County Sheriff's Department, Indian River Press Journal, J & L Consulting, Jill, Jim, Kim Jones, Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, MSNBC, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Charles W. McKinnon, Mcafee, Mckinnon & Hamilton PLLC, Metro PCS Metro, Microsoft, Minnesota Star Tribune, NBC, New York Times, Timothy Noonan, Norton Antivirus, Mike O'rielly, Old Orchid HOA, Old Orchid Residents, Orlando Sentinel, Ajit Pai, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Potts, Quality Health Care, Jessica Rosenworcel, Christine Ross, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Lindsay N. Shroyer, Arlene Smilov, State of Florida, Suntimes, The Boston Globe, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Justice, USA Today, Ed Uttrich, Van Devoorde Hall Law, Verizon, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Andrew Wheeler, William Wilhelm, Christopher Wray, YouTube, Albert Zolezzi, commercial advertisers, lndlan River County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak.(jas) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. (Summonses not issued for the following individuals: Deputy Atkinson, Deputy Alrandian, Charles McKinnon, Ed Vitridge, 1st Fire & Security, Inc., Keith VtKalish, Minnesota Star Tribune, Chicago Suntimes, The Boston Globe, Comcast Corporation, Verizon Board of Directors, Michael Beam-Florida Dept. of Health, Dr. Linday N. Shroyer, Dr. Taher Husainy) (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued (F.C.C.,Ajait Pai, Mignon Clyburn, etc)(Richard Gripenberg & Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg) (Dr. Ramos, Dr. Moss, Dr. Yergen, etc)(Dr. Coppola, Christine Ross). Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Multiple Parties listed on individual summons. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Apple, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Charter Communications, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Ron Desantis, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Huszar, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox News, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Goldman Sachs, Google, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Indian River County Mosquito Control, J & L Consulting, Kim Jones, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Mcafee, Microsoft, NBC, New York Times, Norton Antivirus, Orlando Sentinel, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Quality Health Care, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Arlene Smilov, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, USA Today, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Christopher Wray, Youtube, Albert Zolezzi. (kpe) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/1/2021) (kpe). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/1/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS200002671. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to #4 Order, by Jacek Kazmierczak. (kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1st Fire and Security, 32963 Newspaper, ABC, Apple, Atlanta Journal Constitution, Chris Avery, Bank of America, William Barr, Rachael Beam, Alec Blakely, Pam Bondi, Boost Mobile, Boston Herald, Buffalo News, CBS, CNN, CVS Pharmacy, Brendan Carr, Charter Communications, Chicago Tribune, Church of Scientology, Mignon Clyburn, Comcast, Ron Desantis, Dr. Basil Keller, Dr. Benjamin, Dr. Coppola, Dr. Creelman, Dr. Dimberg, Dr. Hussainy, Dr. Huszar, Dr. Kalish, Dr. Moss, Dr. Ramos, Dr. Shroyer, Dr. Yergen, Environmental Protection Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Federal Communications Commission, Federal Department of Health, Florida Bar, Floridascapes Lawn & Landscape, Fox, Fox News, Frank at UF, Glaxo-Smith-Kline, Globe, Goldman Sachs, Google, Richard Gripenberg, Health and Human Services, Home Depot, Indian River County, Indian River County Mosquito Control, J & L Consulting, Jill, Jim, Kim Jones, Evelyn Kopke-Gripenberg, LA Times, Margaret Libbey, MSNBC, Tom Maher, Mayo Clinic, Mcafee, Mckinnon & Hamilton PLLC, Metro PCS Metro, Microsoft, Minnesota Tribune, NBC, New York Times, Timothy Noonan, Norton Antivirus, Mike O'rielly, Old Orchid HOA, Old Orchid Residents, Orlando Sentinel, Ajit Pai, Michael Paschetti, Bill Posey, Quality Health Care, Jessica Rosenworcel, Christine Ross, Rick Scott, Seattle Times, Arlene Smilov, State of Florida, Suntimes, The Indian River Press Journal, Time Warner Cable, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Justice, USA Today, Ed Uttrich, Van Devoorde Hall Law, Verizon, Walgreens Pharmacy, Washington Times, Andrew Wheeler, William Wilhelm and Annemarie Craft, Bar Counsel, Christopher Wray, Youtube, Albert Zolezzi, commercial advertisers, lndlan River County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacek Kazmierczak. (ebz) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Subpoenas, #3 Summon(s))(ebz) Modified date filed on 2/18/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mayo Clinic is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases where WALGREENS PHARMACY is a litigant