This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 16:55:58 (UTC).

Gwendolyn Kayfes v. BMW of North America, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Gwendolyn Kayfes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02438

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwendolyn Kayfes

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

McKenna Motors Norwalk Inc.

Does 1 through 75

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R Vachon

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Vachon

Po Box 501977

San Diego, CA 92150

Steven A Simons

Attorney at Steven Simons Law Office

9010 Corbin Avenue Suite 17B

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Daniel R Villegas

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Melanie S Cliff

Attorney at Cliff LLP

17322 Murphy Avenue

Irvine, CA 92614

Lisa L Loveridge

Attorney at Cliff LLP

17322 Murphy Avenue

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California. (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#23

(#23) JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is remanded to state court #22 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#22

(#22) MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Motion to Remand #11 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Document No. 11) is granted. 2. BMW shall pay plaintiff $4,375, consisting of $350 in costs, and $4,025 in attorney's fees. (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#20

(#20) JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Kayfes. (Vachon, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#17

(#17) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa L Loveridge re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 (rolm) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#16

(#16) REPLY in Support of Motion MOTION to Remand #11 filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Kayfes. (Vachon, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand Motion

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#17) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa L Loveridge re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 (rolm) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#5

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 4-13-22. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#4

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 4-13-22. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#3

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 4-13-22. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#2

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 4-13-22. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration Samantha M. Koopersmith

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California. (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is remanded to state court #22 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Motion to Remand #11 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Document No. 11) is granted. 2. BMW shall pay plaintiff $4,375, consisting of $350 in costs, and $4,025 in attorney's fees. (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is continued to 7/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Kayfes. (Vachon, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand #11 , currently set for hearing on June 9, 2022, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is continued to 6/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Mail Returned addressed to Lisa L Loveridge re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 (rolm) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY in Support of Motion MOTION to Remand #11 filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Kayfes. (Vachon, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Remand #11 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on 4-13-22. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. [SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, McKenna Motors Norwalk Inc., and Does filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Kayfes. [SUBMITED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20NWCV00376 Receipt No: ACACDC-33111673 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Samantha M. Koopersmith, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Samantha Koopersmith added to party BMW of North America, LLC (pty:dft))(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCKENNA MOTORS NORWALK INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Koopersmith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Villegas