This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:13:52 (UTC).

Kaweah Delta Health Care District et al v. Alex M. Azar II

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Kaweah Delta Health Care District filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex M Azar II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06564

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marin General Hospital

Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN doing business as Huntington Hospital also known as Huntington Memorial Hospital

County of Riverside doing business as Riverside University Health Systems - Medical Center also known as Riverside County Regional Medical Center

County of Contra Costa doing business as Contra Costa Regional Medical Center

County of San Bernardino doing business as Arrowhead Regional Medical Center

Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership doing business as Good Samaritan Hospital

Dameron Hospital Association doing business as Dameron Hospital

Chinese Hospital Association doing business as Chinese Hospital

Riverside County Regional Medical Center

Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare doing business as Casa Colina Hospital

Kern County Hospital Authority doing business as Kern Medical Center

American Hospital Management Corporation doing business as Mad River Community Hospital

Watsonville Hospital Corporation doing business as Watsonville Community Hospital

County of Monterey doing business as Natividad Medical Center

City of El Centro doing business as El Centro Regional Medical Center

Enloe Medical Center

Valley Presbyterian Hospital

Community Memorial Health System doing business as Community Memorial Hospital San Buenaventura

CMCM, Inc. doing business as College Hospital Costa Mesa

County of Ventura doing business as Ventura County Medical Center

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lloyd Alan Bookman

Attorney at Hooper Lundy and Bookman PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David J Vernon

Attorney at Hooper Lundy and Bookman PC

401 9Th Stree Nw Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

David Jacob Vernon

Attorney at Hooper Lundy and Bookman PC

401 9Th Street, Nw Suite 550

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Processing Department. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William Barr, US Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Alex Azar, Secretary, US Dept. of Health and Human Servs.. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#8

(#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27333457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party American Hospital Management Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Antelope Valley Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Beverly Community Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHLB, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CMCM, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Chinese Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party City of El Centro(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Memorial Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Contra Costa(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Monterey(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Riverside(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Mateo(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Ventura(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Dameron Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Deanco Healthcare, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Eisenhower Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party El Camino Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Enloe Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Heart Hospital of BK, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kaweah Delta Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kern County Hospital Authority(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Lompoc Valley Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Madera Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marin General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marshall Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Methodist Hospital of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Northbay Healthcare Group(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oak Valley Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oroville Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pacifica of the Valley Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Redlands Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Saint Agnes Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Benito Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Sierra View Local Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Somona Valley Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party The County of Santa Clara(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Tri-City Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Valley Presbyterian Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Washington Township Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Watsonville Hospital Corporation(pty:pla))(Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Processing Department. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William Barr, US Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Alex Azar, Secretary, US Dept. of Health and Human Servs.. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar. (shb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27333457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party American Hospital Management Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Antelope Valley Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Beverly Community Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHLB, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CMCM, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Chinese Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party City of El Centro(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Memorial Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Contra Costa(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Monterey(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Riverside(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Mateo(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Ventura(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Dameron Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Deanco Healthcare, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Eisenhower Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party El Camino Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Enloe Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Heart Hospital of BK, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kaweah Delta Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kern County Hospital Authority(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Lompoc Valley Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Madera Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marin General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marshall Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Methodist Hospital of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Northbay Healthcare Group(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oak Valley Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oroville Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pacifica of the Valley Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Redlands Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Saint Agnes Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Benito Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Sierra View Local Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Somona Valley Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party The County of Santa Clara(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Tri-City Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Valley Presbyterian Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Washington Township Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Watsonville Hospital Corporation(pty:pla))(Bookman, Lloyd) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marin General Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COUNTY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ENLOE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant