This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:12:03 (UTC).

Will Kaupelis et al v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Will Kaupelis filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01203

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Ortega

Will Kaupelis

Defendant

Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel D Smith

Attorney at Bursor and Fisher PA

1990 North California Boulevard Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Blair Elizabeth Reed

Attorney at Bursor and Fisher PA

1990 North California Boulevard Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Lawrence Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor and Fisher PA

1990 North California Boulevard Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel J Herling

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

44 Montgomery Street 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Samantha Joyce Duplantis

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

44 Montgomery Street 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(f) [Corrected] filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#18

(#18) STATUS REPORT (Joint Rule 26(f) Report) filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#17

(#17) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re Stipulation for Protective Order #16 . (sbou) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

16 #1

Proposed Order

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION (1) SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) VACATING DEADLINES UNDER LOCAL RULE 23-3 #10 by Judge James V. Selna. 1. Plaintiff's time to file an opposition to Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is August 19, 2019; 2. Defendant's time to file a reply brief in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss is September 6, 2019; 3. The hearing on Defendants motion will be set for September 16, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 4. The deadline to file a motion for class certification pursuant to Local Rule 23-3 is vacated. The parties shall meet and confer and propose a briefing schedule in connection with the initial case management conference. (es) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

14 #9

Exhibit I

14 #10

Exhibit J

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendant's 12(b) Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint) (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

13 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendant's 12(b) Motio

13 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class

14 #1

Exhibit A

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #3

Exhibit C

14 #4

Exhibit D

14 #5

Exhibit E

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(f) [Corrected] filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STATUS REPORT (Joint Rule 26(f) Report) filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re Stipulation for Protective Order #16 . (sbou) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION (1) SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) VACATING DEADLINES UNDER LOCAL RULE 23-3 #10 by Judge James V. Selna. 1. Plaintiff's time to file an opposition to Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is August 19, 2019; 2. Defendant's time to file a reply brief in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss is September 6, 2019; 3. The hearing on Defendants motion will be set for September 16, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 4. The deadline to file a motion for class certification pursuant to Local Rule 23-3 is vacated. The parties shall meet and confer and propose a briefing schedule in connection with the initial case management conference. (es) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of 12(b) Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendant's 12(b) Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint) (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc., (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel J Herling on behalf of Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Attorney Daniel J Herling added to party Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/12/2019. (lb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega, (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23933048 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Will Kaupelis(pty:pla), Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Frank Ortega(pty:pla))(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.