This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 08:51:35 (UTC).

Kaufmann v. Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Kaufmann filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10379

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Kaufmann

Defendants

Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Douglas M. Fambrough, III

J. Kevin Buchi

Stephen Doberstein

Martin Freed

Patrick M. Gray

Stephen J. Hoffman

Adam M. Koppel

Marc Kozin

Cynthia Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shane Thomas Rowley

Attorney at Rowley Law PLLC

50 Main Streetste 1000

White Plains, NY 10606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick M. Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25426928)Document filed by David Kaufmann..(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 2/4/2022 at 1:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the telephone conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/7/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick M. Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. Document filed by David Kaufmann. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick M. Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. Document filed by David Kaufmann. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 2/4/2022 at 1:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the telephone conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/7/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick M. Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25426928)Document filed by David Kaufmann..(Rowley, Shane) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shane Thomas Rowley