This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 07:09:25 (UTC).

Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Kaufman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Salesforce com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04491

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Philip Kaufman

Defendant

Salesforce.com Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Guerrero Liston

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Alex Gregg Patchen

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Ari Jason Jaffess

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Mord Michael Lewis

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Jack Russo

Attorney at Computerlaw Group LLP

401 Florence Street

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Joseph A. Greco

Attorney at Computerlaw Group LLP

401 Florence Street

Palo Alto, Ca, CA 94301

Defendant Attorneys

Sam Stephen Stake

Attorney at Quinn Emmanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ray Robert Zado

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Ste 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Brian Paul Biddinger

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Kevin P.B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Edward John DeFranco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#88

#81

#75

#65

#58

#52

#99

98 #1

Proposed Order

#98

96 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#96

#94

#93

#92

#90

89 #1

*Restricted*

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Proposed Order and Stipulation for Dismissal by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 7/21/2021) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#97) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#95) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Salesforce.com Inc.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Greco (Greco, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Russo (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#91) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING Case Management Conference to 7/14/2021, at 10:00 AM, by telephone. Case Management Statement due 7/7/2021. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/28/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Abramson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Salesforce.com, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Ronald Abramson re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-2880 (AKH). Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21326235)Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A US Pat No 7885981, #2 Exhibit EX-B US Pat No 10025801, #3 Exhibit EX-C US Pat Pub 2019/00951173A1, #4 Exhibit EX-D Notice Letters).(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Greco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORD MICHAEL LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Gregg Patchen