Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:42:55 (UTC).

Kaufman v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Kaufman filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Kaufman

Defendants

Jo Griffith

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank M. Aerni

Attorney at BERRY LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

6940 O Street, Suite 400

Lincoln, NE 68510

Defendant Attorney

Lynnett M. Wagner

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER that the Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #18 ) is accepted. Any objections are deemed waived. The United States Attorney's Notice of Substitution (Filing No. #8 ) and supporting Certification (Filing No. 8-1) are approved. The United States of America is substituted for Jo Griffith as the party defendant in this case. See 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(2). Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman's Motion to Remand (Filing No. #10 ) is denied in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#18

(#18) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), that: a. The motion for remand filed by the plaintiff, (Filing No. #10 ) be denied; b. The governments motion, (Filing No. #8 ), be granted, and c. The United States be substituted as the named defendant in this case. The defendant is notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

17 #2

Exhibit

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) INDEX in support of Reply Brief #16 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#16

(#16) REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Substitute Party #8 , Brief #15 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#15

(#15) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

14 #1

Declaration of Jo Griffith, Domiciliary Chief or Program Manager in Grand Islan

#14

(#14) INDEX in opposition to by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jo Griffith, Domiciliary Chief or Program Manager in Grand Island)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

12 #2

Exhibit

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) INDEX in support of Brief #11 , MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#11

(#11) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit B, Certification by U.S. Attorney Joseph P. Kelly

#8

(#8) MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, Certification by U.S. Attorney Joseph P. Kelly)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Attached State Court Pleadings

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER that the Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #18 ) is accepted. Any objections are deemed waived. The United States Attorney's Notice of Substitution (Filing No. #8 ) and supporting Certification (Filing No. 8-1) are approved. The United States of America is substituted for Jo Griffith as the party defendant in this case. See 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(2). Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman's Motion to Remand (Filing No. #10 ) is denied in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), that: a. The motion for remand filed by the plaintiff, (Filing No. #10 ) be denied; b. The governments motion, (Filing No. #8 ), be granted, and c. The United States be substituted as the named defendant in this case. The defendant is notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) INDEX in support of Reply Brief #16 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Substitute Party #8 , Brief #15 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INDEX in opposition to by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jo Griffith, Domiciliary Chief or Program Manager in Grand Island)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued pending a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Filing No. 10). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INDEX in support of Brief #11 , MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #7 Declaration as to Filing Notice of Notice of Removal by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, Certification by U.S. Attorney Joseph P. Kelly)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ryan Kaufman from District Court in Hall County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-388 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Jo Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attached State Court Pleadings)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint #1 and Motion to Substitute Party #3 are stricken for the following reason: documents are not signed. The party is directed to re-file the document. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STRICKEN - MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Wagner, Lynnett) Modified on 6/25/2020 to strike per order 6 (ADB). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION as to Filing Notice of Notice of Removal by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) STRICKEN - NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ryan Kaufman from District Court of Hall County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-388 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Jo Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Lynnett) Modified on 6/25/2020 to strike per order 6 (ADB). (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank M. Aerni