This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:30:17 (UTC).

Kaufman v. Salesforce.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Kaufman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Salesforce com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06879

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Michael Philip Kaufman

Michael Philip Kaufman

Debtor In Possession and Defendant

Salesforce.com, Inc.

1095 Avenue Of The Americas, 6Th Ave

New York, NY 10036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald Abramson

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

David Guerrero Liston

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Alex Gregg Patchen

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Ari Jason Jaffess

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Mord Michael Lewis

Attorney at Liston Abramson LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Paul Biddinger

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Kevin P.B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn, Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(RedwdCA)

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Ste. 560

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Edward John DeFranco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#20

(#20) LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 29, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by October 26, 2020, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for the parties, and subject to the approval and order of the Court, that: 1. Defendant, Salesforce hereby waives the defenses of insufficient process and insufficient service of process, but expressly reserves, and fully retains the right to assert, all other defenses without limitation. 2. Salesforce's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 20, 2020. (Salesforce.com, Inc. answer due 10/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/18/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#13

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit EX-D Notice Letters

1 #3

Exhibit EX-C US Pat Pub 2019/00951173A1

1 #1

Exhibit EX-A US Pat No 7885981

#1

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Ronald Abramson dated October 23, 2020 re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. . Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin P.B. Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER MOTION for Conference RE: Leave to File for Motion to Dismiss and Strike addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Kevin Johnson dated 10/20/2020. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Johnson, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. Any currently scheduled conference or oral argument before the Court is adjourned. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 29, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by October 26, 2020, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2020, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for the parties, and subject to the approval and order of the Court, that: 1. Defendant, Salesforce hereby waives the defenses of insufficient process and insufficient service of process, but expressly reserves, and fully retains the right to assert, all other defenses without limitation. 2. Salesforce's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including October 20, 2020. (Salesforce.com, Inc. answer due 10/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/18/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John DeFranco on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc...(DeFranco, Edward) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Salesforce.com, Inc...(Biddinger, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ronald Abramson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Salesforce.com, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to salesforce.com, inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Ronald Abramson re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-2880 (AKH). Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21326235)Document filed by Michael Philip Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX-A US Pat No 7885981, #2 Exhibit EX-B US Pat No 10025801, #3 Exhibit EX-C US Pat Pub 2019/00951173A1, #4 Exhibit EX-D Notice Letters).(Abramson, Ronald) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORD MICHAEL LEWIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Gregg Patchen