This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 08:08:41 (UTC).

Kauffman et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Kauffman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04160

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Don Kauffman

Leona Kauffman

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Blake Montgomery

Attorney at Montgomery Law Firm PLLC

P.O. Box 785

Hope, AR 71802

Defendant Attorney

Eric Eggburn

Attorney at Munson Rowlett Moore Boone P.A.

400 W. Capitol Ave, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 3/5/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/12/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2020. (rwg) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company filed by Don Kauffman, Leona Kauffman. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #1

Ex. A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hempstead County, case number 29CV-19-179-1 filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Documents)(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 3/5/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/12/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2020. (rwg) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2043273.. (Eggburn, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/26/2019. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company filed by Don Kauffman, Leona Kauffman. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hempstead County, case number 29CV-19-179-1 filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Documents)(mll) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less