This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:34:06 (UTC).

Kattis v. Rockwood

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Kattis filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Rockwood. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06916

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Kattis

Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370

Respondent

Mark Rockwood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Marcia R. Kucera

Attorney at Suffolk County District Attorney

Criminal Courts Building, 200 Center Drive

Riverhead, NY 11901

SUFFOLK COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC

NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC

Attorney at New York State Attorney Generals Office

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Letter MOTION to Intervene State Court proceedings pursuant to Younger Abstention Doctrine letter/response in opposition to petitioner's intervention application under the Younger Abstention Doctrine filed by Mark Rockwood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#12

(#12) Letter MOTION to Intervene State Court proceedings pursuant to Younger Abstention Doctrine by Christopher Kattis. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) First MOTION to Dismiss letter/motion to dismiss petitioner's habeas application, dated December 2, 2019 by Mark Rockwood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Kattis. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia R. Kucera on behalf of Mark Rockwood (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 12/18/2019 Re: Response to #7 Letter. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-3115-JMA, 19-cv-3119-JMA and 19-cv-7084-JMA (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-3115-JMA and 19-cv-3119-JMA (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Kattis. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Christopher Kattis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Letter MOTION to Intervene State Court proceedings pursuant to Younger Abstention Doctrine letter/response in opposition to petitioner's intervention application under the Younger Abstention Doctrine filed by Mark Rockwood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter MOTION to Intervene State Court proceedings pursuant to Younger Abstention Doctrine by Christopher Kattis. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER finding as moot #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's motion is moot in light of the Court's December 13, 2019 Order. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/6/2020. (Simmons, James) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION to Dismiss letter/motion to dismiss petitioner's habeas application, dated December 2, 2019 by Mark Rockwood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Kattis. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia R. Kucera on behalf of Mark Rockwood (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kucera, Marcia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 12/18/2019 Re: Response to #7 Letter. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-3115-JMA, 19-cv-3119-JMA and 19-cv-7084-JMA (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketORDERED, that: (1) Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; (2) Within sixty (60) days of receipt of this Order, the Attorney General of the State of New York, or the District Attorney of Suffolk County, as attorney for Respondent, shall: (a) show cause before this Court by the filing of a return to the petition, why a writ of habeas corpus should not be issued; and (b) shall serve a copy of their return on Petitioner herein and file the original thereof with proof of such service, with the Clerk of this Court; (3) Simultaneously, Respondent is required to electronically file the State Court Record--including the trial transcript and record; copies of Petitioner's and the District Attorney's briefs on appeal; briefs in connection with any proceedings pursuant to Section 440 of the New York Criminal Procedure Law; briefs in connection with any proceedings pursuant to an application for a writ of error coram nobis; and all relevant state court decisions and opinions--with no individual attachment exceeding twenty (20) megabytes; (4) Respondent is also directed to supply a hard copy of the State Court Record to Chambers clearly marked Courtesy Copy, original filed on ECF; (5) Petitioner, within twenty-one (21) days of service of a copy of the return, shall file a reply, if any, with the Clerk of this Court and serve a copy thereof upon respondents; (6) If the District Attorney serves and files a motion to dismiss on procedural grounds, the District Attorney may defer filing a return (and the accompanying State Court Record) pending the determination of the motion to dismiss; and (7) Service of a copy of this Order to Show Cause shall be made by the Clerk of this Court electronically, together with a copy of the petition, to the Attorney General of the State of New York and to the District Attorney of Suffolk County, and by mailing a copy of this Order to Petitioner. Petitioner is also reminded that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a) and Section 205(c)(3) of the E-Government Act of 2002, only initials and not full names of minors should be submitted in court filings. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/13/2019. (Simmons, James) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-3115-JMA and 19-cv-3119-JMA (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Kattis. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Christopher Kattis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.