This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 10:39:39 (UTC).

Katherine Kang v. Marshalls et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Katherine Kang filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marshalls. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01717

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine Kang

Defendants

Marshalls

The TJX Companies, Inc.

Cintas

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Cintas Corporation No. 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul William Ralph

Attorney at Paul W Ralph Law Offices

500 North State College Boulevard Suite 1100

Orange, CA 92868

Defendant Attorneys

Gene S Stone

Attorney at Homan and Stone

1461 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92373

Manuel Saldana

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully and Mansukhani LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

M Christopher Hall

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Initial DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1) filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#20

(#20) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial November 8, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference October 24, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off July 25, 2022. Expert Discovery Cut-off September 14, 2022. Law and Motion Cut-off September 19, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #18 . The Scheduling Conference set for November 15, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. [See document for further details.] (es) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#18

(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Katherine Kang.. (Ralph, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2021)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc. identifying TJX Companies Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#16

(#16) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2.. (Hall, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc., (Attorney Gene S Stone added to party Marshalls(pty:dft), Attorney Gene S Stone added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Answer to Complaint re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#9

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on October 19, 2021. (Hall, M) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Declaration of M. Christopher Hall in Support of Cintas Corporation No. 2's

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Initial DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1) filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial November 8, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference October 24, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off July 25, 2022. Expert Discovery Cut-off September 14, 2022. Law and Motion Cut-off September 19, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #18 . The Scheduling Conference set for November 15, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. [See document for further details.] (es) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Katherine Kang.. (Ralph, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc. identifying TJX Companies Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2.. (Hall, M) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc., (Attorney Gene S Stone added to party Marshalls(pty:dft), Attorney Gene S Stone added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Answer to Complaint re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Stone, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on October 19, 2021. (Hall, M) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE Confirming Notification to State Court of Removal filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2. (Hall, M) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Cintas Corporation No. 2. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 30)(esa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against defendants Cintas, Does, Marshalls, The TJX Companies, Inc, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Katherine Kang. (filed in state court 4/13/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 9) (esa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No 2, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on October 15, 2021. (Saldana, Manuel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No 2 identifying Cintas Corporation No. 3; Cintas Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Saldana, Manuel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No 2, identifying Katherine Kang, plantiff; Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendant; The TJX Companies, Inc., Defendant; Cintas Corporation No. 2, Defendant. (Saldana, Manuel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No 2. (Saldana, Manuel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-2021-01195223-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32158965 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Cintas Corporation No 2. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Christopher Hall in Support of Cintas Corporation No. 2's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Manuel Saldana added to party Cintas Corporation No 2(pty:dft))(Saldana, Manuel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINTAS CORPORATION NO 2 DBA CINTAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Marshalls is a litigant

Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gene S. Stone(Designation Retained)