This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2019 at 08:13:57 (UTC).

Katchatag v. Brooks et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Katchatag filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Brooks. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah M. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah M. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond C. Katchatag

Seward, AK 99664

Defendants

Laura Brooks

Gabe Gluesing

Jillian Ryan

Amanda Loomis

Lynne Lawrence

Bryan Pherson

 

Court Documents

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Account Statement

#3

#2

1 #9

9

1 #8

8

1 #7

7

1 #6

6

1 #5

5

1 #4

4

1 #3

3

1 #2

2

1 #1

1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Waiver of Copies Made by the Court. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 7/31/2019. The Clerk of Court is to send Mr. Katchatag copies of his docketed filings for free. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Waiver of Copies Made by the Court by Raymond C. Katchatag.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/9/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Brooks et al,. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond C. Katchatag. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Laura Brooks, Gabe Gluesing, Lynne Lawrence, Amanda Loomis, Bryan Pherson, Jillian Ryan, filed by Raymond C. Katchatag. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less