This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 09:00:01 (UTC).

Katana Silicon Technologies LLC v. Micron Technology, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Katana Silicon Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Katana Silicon Technologies LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Micron Technology Inc

Micron Semiconductor Products Inc

Micron Technology Texas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Scott W. Breedlove

Bradley David Liddle

E. Leon Carter

Seth A. Lindner

Theresa M. Dawson

Keely E. Duke

Mallam John Prior

Daniel L. Schmid

Michael C. Pomeroy

Nathan I. Cox

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Amanda Tessar

M. Craig Tyler

Amy E. Simpson

Daniel Graham

David T Krueck

Trevor Jonathan Bervik

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

47 #4

Exhibit 3

47 #3

Exhibit 2

47 #2

Exhibit 1

47 #1

Memorandum in Support

47 #47

Main Document

#45

(#45) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy E. Simpson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2433486.)Daniel Graham appearing for Defendants Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Technology Texas, LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2022 (Graham, Daniel)

#43

(#43) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael Pomeroy. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2429858.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Responses due by 8/23/2022 (Duke, Keely)

27 #1

Memorandum in Support

27 #27

Main Document

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Micron Technology Texas, LLC (Breedlove, Scott)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. (Breedlove, Scott)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#48) A REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(lm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Duke, Keely)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amy E. Simpson for Micron Semiconductor Products Inc,Amy E. Simpson for Micron Semiconductor Products Inc,Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology Inc,Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology Inc,Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology Texas, LLC,Amy E. Simpson for Micron Technology Texas, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy E. Simpson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2433486.)Daniel Graham appearing for Defendants Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Technology Texas, LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2022 (Graham, Daniel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING Dkt. #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michael C. Pomeroy for Katana Silicon Technologies LLC,Michael C. Pomeroy for Katana Silicon Technologies LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael Pomeroy. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2429858.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Responses due by 8/23/2022 (Duke, Keely)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (DKT. #40 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Daniel L. Schmid for Katana Silicon Technologies LLC,Daniel L. Schmid for Katana Silicon Technologies LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Technology Texas, LLC. Replies due by 8/15/2022.(Graham, Daniel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Daniel Schmid. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2429459.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Responses due by 8/22/2022 (Duke, Keely)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. #38 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Trevor Bervik for Micron Semiconductor Products Inc,Trevor Bervik for Micron Semiconductor Products Inc,Trevor Bervik for Micron Technology Inc,Trevor Bervik for Micron Technology Inc,Trevor Bervik for Micron Technology Texas, LLC,Trevor Bervik for Micron Technology Texas, LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. (Breedlove, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Texas, LLC, and Micron Technology, Inc. (cc3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Breedlove, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. Micron Technology Texas, LLC (Breedlove, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. (Breedlove, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. (dl) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15784041). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Katana Silicon Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Breedlove, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less