This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:20:50 (UTC).

Kat Construction Management, LLC v. Liberty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Kat Construction Management, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02527

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kat Construction Management, LLC

Defendant

Liberty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathanael Thomas Archuleta

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

James Elliot O'Donnell

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler M. Nemkov

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Hilary Dawn Wells

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#15

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

4 #2

Attachment 2

4 #1

Attachment 1

#4

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After conferral pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.2(d), and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 1:20-cv-02527-CMA-KLM. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/19/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tyler M. Nemkov on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Tyler M. Nemkov added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Nemkov, Tyler) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/7/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Hilary Dawn Wells on behalf of Liberty Insurance Corporation (Wells, Hilary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge.All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2527-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/6/20 re: #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation All parties do not consent.. (Wells, Hilary) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hilary Dawn Wells on behalf of Liberty Insurance CorporationAttorney Hilary Dawn Wells added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Wells, Hilary) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Elliot O'Donnell on behalf of Kat Construction Management, LLCAttorney James Elliot O'Donnell added to party Kat Construction Management, LLC(pty:pla) (O'Donnell, James) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on October 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order was due to be filed with the Court by September 30, 2020 [#4]. The parties have failed to file the proposed Scheduling Order. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for October 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to November 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before October 30, 2020. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the imposition of sanctions. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on October 2, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, ) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kat Construction Management, LLC. Liberty Insurance Corporation served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/27/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/29/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7449184)Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Kat Construction Management, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Kat Construction Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathanael Thomas Archuleta