This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2022 at 08:47:40 (UTC).

Kasul v. Madavor Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 Kasul filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Madavor Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Hala Y. Jarbou and Ray Kent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00914

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hala Y. Jarbou

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelley Kasul

Defendant

Madavor Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank S. Hedin

Attorney at Hedin Hall LLP

1395 Brickell Ave., Ste. 900

Miami, FL 33131

Sharon S. Almonrode

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm PC

950 W University Dr., Ste. 300

Rochester, MI 48307

E. Powell Miller

Attorney at Miller Law Firm PC

950 W University Dr., Ste. 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Gregory A. Mitchell

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm PC

950 W University Dr., Ste. 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Joseph I. Marchese

Attorney at Burson & Fisher, P.A. (NY)

888 Seventh Ave.

New York, NY 10019

Philip L. Fraietta

Attorney at Burson & Fisher, P.A. (NY)

888 Seventh Ave.

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #14 ; responsive pleading deadline extended to 12/12/22; no further adjournments will be granted; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Miller, E.) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #12 ; defendant is to file a responsive pleading on or before 11/28/22; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTES of status conference held before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (Court Reporter: Genevieve Hamlin) (kjw) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Madavor Media, LLC served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022 (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

(#8) NOTICE of status conference set for 10/13/2022 at 9:00 AM at by video before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (kjw) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#7

(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. AO-CA-089 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jrg) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

1 #15

Exhibit N

1 #14

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #1

Index

#1

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #14 ; responsive pleading deadline extended to 12/12/22; no further adjournments will be granted; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Miller, E.) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #12 ; defendant is to file a responsive pleading on or before 11/28/22; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTES of status conference held before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (Court Reporter: Genevieve Hamlin) (kjw) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Madavor Media, LLC served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022 (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Frank S. Hedin on behalf of plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Hedin, Frank) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Videoconference Information for 10/13/2022 hearing. RECORDING OR BROADCASTING OF THIS PROCEEDING IS PROHIBITED. W.D. Mich. LGenR 4.1(c)(i) and (ii). [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Kelley Kasul, Madavor Media, LLC only] (kjw) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of status conference set for 10/13/2022 at 9:00 AM at by video before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (kjw) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. AO-CA-089 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jrg) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Madavor Media, LLC (ns) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Jane M. Beckering (ns) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Philip L. Fraietta on behalf of plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph I. Marchese on behalf of plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Cognate Case by plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory A. Mitchell on behalf of plaintiff Kelley Kasul (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kelley Kasul in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6862168 (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand Class Action Complaint Jury Trial Demanded against Madavor Media, LLC filed by Kelley Kasul (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q) (Miller, E.) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory A. Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank S. Hedin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E Powell Miller