This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:15:17 (UTC).

Kaster v. Select Portfolio Servicing et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Kaster filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02180

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Kaster

Defendants

Innovis Data Solutions, Inc

Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC

Select Portfolio Servicing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaina R Plaksin

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148-7700

Miles N Clark

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Haines & Krieger, LLC

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 350

Henderson, NV 89123

Matthew I Knepper

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly H Dove

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Kiah D. Beverly-Graham

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

50 W. Liberty St., Ste. 510

Reno, NV 89501-1961

R. Samuel Ehlers

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Ramir Mitchell Hernandez

Attorney at WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Summons Innovis

1 #2

Summons FMC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons SPS

#1

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC.(Beverly-Graham, Kiah) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Danny Kaster. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC served on 12/23/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #3 Summons Issued. Innovis Data Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#24

(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, With Prejudice by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#14

(#23) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#10

(#22) ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC.(Beverly-Graham, Kiah) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#17

(#17) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#20

(#20) PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, With Prejudice by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC.(Beverly-Graham, Kiah) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Motions due by 7/22/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement with Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. by Danny Kaster. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC served on 12/23/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing added. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #3 Summons Issued. Innovis Data Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Danny Kaster. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5817093) by Danny Kaster. Proof of service due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FMC, #3 Summons Innovis, #4 Summons SPS)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.