This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 09:57:16 (UTC).

Kassem, et al. v. Renaud, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Kassem filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Renaud. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00946

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kassem Mohamed Ahmed Kassem

Safia Mohamed Mohsen Qasem

Mohamed Ahmed Kassem

Badr Mohamed Ahmed Kassem

Mohsanah Kassem

Kassem

Qasem

Faeq Mohamed Ahmed Kassem

Defendants

Alejandro Mayorkas

Antony Blinken

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Tracy Renaud

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

U.S. Department of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Yaggy, PHV

Attorney at Goldberg & Associated, P.C.

5586 Broadway, Third Floor

Bronx, NY 10463

Julie Ann Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates

14370 Ventura Blvd.

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Defendant Attorney

Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, Sacramento

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #2 Samuel Yaggy's Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2021. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Antony Blinken served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021; U.S. Department of State served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alejandro Mayorkas served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Tracy Renaud,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for U.S. Department of Homeland Security,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for U.S. Department of State (Hemesath, Audrey) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #2 Samuel Yaggy's Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2021. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Julie Ann Goldberg* *Goldberg & Associates* *14370 Ventura Blvd.* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91423*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Julie Ann Goldberg* *Goldberg & Associates* *14370 Ventura Blvd.* *Sherman Oaks, CA 91423*. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Badr Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Kassem Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Mohsanah Kassem, Faeq Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Safia Mohamed Mohsen Qasem for attorney Samuel Yaggy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9656194) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State by Safia Mohamed Mohsen Qasem, Badr Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Mohsanah Kassem, Faeq Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Mohamed Ahmed Kassem, Kassem Mohamed Ahmed Kassem. Attorney Goldberg, Julie Ann added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9655871) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to X, #3 Exhibit Y to II, #4 Exhibit JJ to UU, #5 Exhibit VV to YY)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Department of State is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey Benison Hemesath