This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:53:07 (UTC).

Karras v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Karras filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann M Donnelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03292

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelina M. Karras

College Point, NY 11356

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Frank D. Tankard

Attorney at Social Security Administration

601 E. 12Th St., Ste 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff, pro se, is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of New York for service on Defendant, without prepayment of fees. Defendant must file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by October 14, 2020. Defendant must file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by December 14, 2020; Plaintiff must file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross-motion, by February 12, 2021; and Defendant must file and serve its reply, if any, by March 5, 2021. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/23/2020. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 7/23/2020 Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff, pro se, is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of New York for service on Defendant, without prepayment of fees. Defendant must file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by October 14, 2020. Defendant must file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and administrative record, by December 14, 2020; Plaintiff must file and serve a response to Defendant's motion, and any cross-motion, by February 12, 2021; and Defendant must file and serve its reply, if any, by March 5, 2021. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and (C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memorandum pages limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda includes citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/23/2020. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angelina M. Karras. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angelina M. Karras. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less