This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:41:01 (UTC).

KARR v. UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 KARR filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT AUDIT CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01941

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY KARR

Defendant

UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO doing business as CREDITORS' DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Steinkamp

Attorney at JOHN STEINKAMP & ASSOCIATES

5214 S. East Street, Suite D-1

Indianapolis, IN 46227

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Schultz

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer Jay Kalas

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

322 Indianapolis Boulevard, Suite 201

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

#11

(#11) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by GREGORY KARR. UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO served on 10/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/27/2022.(CBU) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (RAGS) (JRB) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (JRB) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff GREGORY KARR. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's July 19, 2022, Experian credit re

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The May 17, 2022, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN of Personal Service, filed by GREGORY KARR. UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO served on 10/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/27/2022.(CBU) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (RAGS) (JRB) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION d/b/a CREDITOR'S DISCOUNT & AUDIT CO. (JRB) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff GREGORY KARR. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against UNLIMITED PROGRESS CORPORATION, filed by GREGORY KARR. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7304921) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The May 17, 2022, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's July 19, 2022, Experian credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unlimited Progress Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Schultz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Jay Kalas