This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2020 at 07:39:29 (UTC).

KARR et al v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 KARR filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U S Immigration and Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60348

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALDIRENE VASQUEZ

LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR

ZACHARY VASQUEZ

Valdirene Moeira Da Silva

PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA

MICHAEL LYN

LILIANA COHEN

ADOLFO KARR

MARIA REYES

IAN KARR

Defendants

Acting Secretary of Homeland Security

Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Regional Director, for the Southeast Region, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Richard Dominguez

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Mark Andrew Prada

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Defendant Attorneys

Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

Dexter Lee

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4 Street

Miami, FL 33132

Natalie Diaz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION: granting #24 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #17 Petitioners' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #14 Petitioners' Motion for Class Certification; cancelling 27 Telephonic Hearing Set for Monday, March 23, 2020. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

#35

RESTRICTED

#34

RESTRICTED

#20

(#28) SUPPLEMENT to #26 Response to Motion,, #25 Supplement, #24 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, , #20 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Appx I - Karr Family, #2 Exhibit B -- Appx II - Escobar Family, #3 Exhibit C -- Appx III - VasquezFamily, #4 Exhibit D -- Appx IV - Reyes and Lyn Family)(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#16

No Description Available

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #33 Notice of Appeal, filed by LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, LILIANA COHEN, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, ZACHARY VASQUEZ, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, ADOLFO KARR, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ. Date received by USCA: 3/23/20. USCA Case Number: 20-11144-F. (hh) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ re #33 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #33 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Notice of Appeal as to #32 Order Dismissing Case,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings, by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12640652. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION: granting #24 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #17 Petitioners' Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #14 Petitioners' Motion for Class Certification; cancelling 27 Telephonic Hearing Set for Monday, March 23, 2020. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #30 Joint Motion to Reset Hearing and to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, as the Court will enter a ruling by Monday morning. The telephone hearing set in order to accommodate the parties because of the health crisis will be cancelled. A written opinion will be entered by Monday morning. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2020. (km02) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions re 27 Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ( Responses due by 4/3/2020), Joint MOTION to extend TRO by consent re #20 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County Emergency Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Defendant's RESPONSE to #26 Response to Motion,, by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Regional Director, for the Southeast Region, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Diaz, Natalie) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SUPPLEMENT to #26 Response to Motion,, #25 Supplement, #24 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, , #20 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Appx I - Karr Family, #2 Exhibit B -- Appx II - Escobar Family, #3 Exhibit C -- Appx III - VasquezFamily, #4 Exhibit D -- Appx IV - Reyes and Lyn Family)(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#27) PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE HEARING. The hearing set for Monday, March 23, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. will take place as scheduled, but now counsel for all parties shall call chambers (305-523-5110) from a single line at the scheduled time. Counsel shall be prepared to address all pending matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/13/2020. (km02) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Interlocutory Appeal as to #8 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency, by LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12475334. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to refile after service of process #7 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included (Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for Named Plaintiffs and Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Plaintiffs and Proposed Class by LILIANA COHEN, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, IAN KARR, MICHAEL LYN, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA, MARIA REYES, VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, ZACHARY VASQUEZ. Responses due by 3/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Emergency, #2 Exhibit A; Order Staying Removal, Camarena v. Dir., No. 19-13446 (11th Cir. Sept. 23, 2019), #3 Appendix Appendix I, #4 Appendix Appendix II, #5 Appendix Appendix III, #6 Appendix Appendix IV)(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Regional Director, for the Southeast Region, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (pcs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Plaintiff's APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Class Action Complaint for APA Judicial Reivew. Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12467937, filed by VALDIRENE VASQUEZ, IAN KARR, ZACHARY VASQUEZ, MICHAEL LYN, LILIANA COHEN, MARIA REYES, LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR, ADOLFO KARR, PIEDAD DEL CARMEN MARULANDA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #3 Supplement Notice of Related Case(s))(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regional Director, for the Southeast Region, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Acting Secretary of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant