This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 08:23:40 (UTC).

Karp v. Begley et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 a Contract - Security case was filed by Karp against Begley in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Delaware District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01855

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Karp

Defendants

Robert A. Hagemann

David C. Dvorak

Paul M. Bisaro

Betsy J. Bernard

Daniel P. Florin

TPG Partners V, L.P.

Michael W. Michelson

Christopher B Begley

Tony W. Collins

Jeffrey K. Rhodes

KKR Biomet LLC

Larry Glasscock

Gail K. Boudreaux

TPG FOF V-A, L.P.

TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC

TPG FOF V-B, L.P.

Arthur J. Higgins

Michael J. Farrell

Nominal Defendant

Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blake A. Bennett

Attorney at Cooch and Taylor

The Brandywine Building, 1000 N. West Street, 10Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant and Nominal Defendant Attorney

Jody Barillare

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1007 Orange Street, Suite 501

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Verification

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Barillare, Jody) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling with [Proposed] Order by Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, KKR Biomet LLC, Michael W. Michelson, Cecil B. Pickett, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG FOF V-B, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P., TPG Partners V, L.P., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2745743.) - filed by Howard Karp. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (Barillare, Jody) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • SO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:19-cv-01926-LPS, 3 in 1:19-cv-01855-LPS) STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01855-LPS, 1:19-cv-01926-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION Regarding Service, Consolidation, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership, and Scheduling with [Proposed] Order by Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, Cecil B. Pickett, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Christopher B Begley on 10/4/2019; Betsy J. Bernard on 10/4/2019; Paul M. Bisaro on 10/4/2019; Gail K. Boudreaux on 10/4/2019; Tony W. Collins on 10/4/2019; David C. Dvorak on 10/4/2019; Michael J. Farrell on 10/4/2019; Daniel P. Florin on 10/4/2019; Larry Glasscock on 10/4/2019; Robert A. Hagemann on 10/4/2019; Arthur J. Higgins on 10/4/2019; KKR Biomet LLC on 10/4/2019; Michael W. Michelson on 10/4/2019; Cecil B. Pickett on 10/4/2019; Jeffrey K. Rhodes on 10/4/2019; TPG FOF V-A, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG FOF V-B, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC on 10/4/2019; TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC on 10/4/2019; TPG Partners IV, L.P. on 10/4/2019; TPG Partners V, L.P. on 10/4/2019; Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. on 10/4/2019. (myr) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • No Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Christopher B Begley, Betsy J. Bernard, Paul M. Bisaro, Gail K. Boudreaux, Tony W. Collins, David C. Dvorak, Michael J. Farrell, Daniel P. Florin, Larry Glasscock, Robert A. Hagemann, Arthur J. Higgins, KKR Biomet LLC, Michael W. Michelson, Cecil B. Pickett, Jeffrey K. Rhodes, TPG FOF V-A, L.P., TPG FOF V-B, L.P., TPG LVB Co-Invest II LLC, TPG LVB Co-Invest LLC, TPG Partners IV, L.P., TPG Partners V, L.P., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2745743.) - filed by Howard Karp. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.