This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:34:55 (UTC).

KARIDAS et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 KARIDAS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02374

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NIKOLAOS KARIDAS

PATRA KARIDAS

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY

Attorney at ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY BUCKALEW LLC

1240 Old York Road, Suite 101

Warminster, PA 18974

JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN

Attorney at ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY BUCKALEW, LLC

Two Logan Square, 100 N 18Th St Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM HOFMANN

Attorney at BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

960 Harvest Dr, Building B Suite 100

Blue Bell, PA 19422-1900

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Letter dated 7/20/21 FROM MIKE BECK TO FIRST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF PA RE: RETURN OF STATE COURT RECORD; ETC. (JL ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT ORDER THAT THIS MATTER BE REMANDED BACK TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY TO PCCP.(JL) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

4 #1

ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION

#4

(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification dated 5/25/21 (Attachments: #1 ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION)(JL ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of NIKOLAOS KARIDAS, PATRA KARIDAS with Jury Demand(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15145894), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter dated 7/20/21 FROM MIKE BECK TO FIRST JUDICIAL DISTRICT OF PA RE: RETURN OF STATE COURT RECORD; ETC. (JL ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT ORDER THAT THIS MATTER BE REMANDED BACK TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY TO PCCP.(JL) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification dated 5/25/21 (Attachments: #1 ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION)(JL ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(fb) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (fb) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of NIKOLAOS KARIDAS, PATRA KARIDAS with Jury Demand(KOVALSKY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15145894), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H Hofmann(Designation Retained)