This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:47:58 (UTC).

Karetek Holdings LLC v. EyeBuyDirect, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Karetek Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against EyeBuyDirect, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Karetek Holdings LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

EyeBuyDirect, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jay B. Johnson

Howard L. Wernow

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Theresa M. Dawson

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

19 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

19 #1

Exhibit A-US7373515

#19

#14

12 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Karetek Holdings LLC by EyeBuyDirect, Inc..(Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim EYEBUYDIRECT, INC.'S SECTION 101 RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EyeBuyDirect, Inc.. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Karetek Holdings LLC.(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff/Counterdefendant's amended complaint, (Dkt. 19), Defendant/Counterclaimant's motion to dismiss, (Dkt. 12), pertains to a now-superseded pleading and is thus MOOT. See Good River Farms, LP v. TXI Operations, LP, No. 1:17-CV-1117-RP, 2018 WL 1770494, at *3 (W.D. Tex. Apr. 12, 2018); see also King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against EyeBuyDirect, Inc. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Karetek Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US7373515, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #17 Theresa M. Dawson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of EyeBuyDirect, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ricardo Joel Bonilla as to Theresa M. Dawson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13606529) by on behalf of EyeBuyDirect, Inc.. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Theresa M. Dawson. (cj) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of EyeBuyDirect, Inc. . Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party EyeBuyDirect, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party EyeBuyDirect, Inc. (pty:cc) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR >Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Howard L. Wernow. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Howard L. Wernow. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karetek Holdings LLC. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Karetek Holdings LLC . (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13520003), filed by Karetek Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less