This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2020 at 09:25:52 (UTC).

Karetek Holdings LLC v. Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Karetek Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00681

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karetek Holdings LLC

Defendant

Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

#5

5 #1

Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Exhibit A-Courts of Admission

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Wernow ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13819270) by on behalf of Karetek Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Courts of Admission)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Karetek Holdings LLC. (am) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas, LLC. (am) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Karetek Holdings LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/27/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/27/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Karetek Holdings LLC . (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13800410), filed by Karetek Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Standing Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19 Court Procedures)(mc5) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less