This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 07:48:50 (UTC).

Karapatakis et al v. The Bee Factory, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Karapatakis filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Bee Factory, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and LaShann DeArcy Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04573

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dimitrios Karapatakis

Aikaterini Sachinidou

George Karapatakis

Defendants

Athanasios Stagias

The Bee Factory, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen D. Hans

Attorney at Stephen D. Hans & Associates, P.C.

30-30 Northern Boulevard, Suite 401

Long Island City, NY 11101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Dimitrios Karapatakis, George Karapatakis (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by March 29, 2021. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/29/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

2 #1

Stagias summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Stagias summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Affidavit of Service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Athanasios Stagias, The Bee Factory, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13436309 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou, Dimitrios Karapatakis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Hans, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/1/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Dimitrios Karapatakis, George Karapatakis (Hans, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by March 29, 2021. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/29/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Stagias summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Athanasios Stagias, The Bee Factory, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13436309 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by George Karapatakis, Aikaterini Sachinidou, Dimitrios Karapatakis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Hans, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/1/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less