This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:37:48 (UTC).

KARAMOKO v. POLEY

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 KARAMOKO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against POLEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03518

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMMED KARAMOKO

Defendant

SHERRY POLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAM S. BARRIST

Attorney at THE BARRIST FIRM LLC

P.O. Box 1820, 200 W. Baltimore Ave., Suite 101

Media, PA 19063

Defendant Attorney

LYNN A. ZIKOSKI

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HUBSHMAN & FLOOD

5165 Campus Drive, Suite 200

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) NOTICE by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO Letter to Judge Robreno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter from Ronald Vance, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Eduardo C. Robreno to Adam Barrist, Esq. dated August 26, 2020, re: A review of the Court's records shows that a pleading has not been filed in response to the complaint in the above-captioned action. You may file a request with the Clerk of Court for an entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the F.R.C.P. If the request for default is not filed by September 18, 2020 the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the Defendant(s) for lack of prosecution. (rv) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LYNN A. ZIKOSKI on behalf of SHERRY POLEY (ZIKOSKI, LYNN) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon DEFENDANT by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION on 07/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SHERRY POLEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429893.), filed by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO.(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO Letter to Judge Robreno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Ronald Vance, Deputy Clerk to Hon. Eduardo C. Robreno to Adam Barrist, Esq. dated August 26, 2020, re: A review of the Court's records shows that a pleading has not been filed in response to the complaint in the above-captioned action. You may file a request with the Clerk of Court for an entry of default in accordance with Rule 55 of the F.R.C.P. If the request for default is not filed by September 18, 2020 the Court may enter an order dismissing the case against the Defendant(s) for lack of prosecution. (rv) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LYNN A. ZIKOSKI on behalf of SHERRY POLEY (ZIKOSKI, LYNN) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon DEFENDANT by FED EX WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION on 07/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to SHERRY POLEY. E-mailed to counsel on 7/20/20 (mbh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO. (JL ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SHERRY POLEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14429893.), filed by MOHAMMED KARAMOKO.(BARRIST, ADAM) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less