This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 07:46:03

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Kapsalis against Sicking Safety Systems, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-CV-00744
  • Filing Date 05/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Other Contract
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge R David Proctor
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Dr. Dean Sicking
  • Represented By
    • Christopher J. Esbrook
    • Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
    • Brannon J Buck
  • Plaintiff Zikap, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Donald John Angelini, Jr.
    • Davis Shuford Vaughn
    • Edward S Sledge, IV
  • Plaintiff Marc Kapsalis
  • Represented By
    • Donald John Angelini, Jr.
    • Edward S Sledge, IV
    • Davis Shuford Vaughn
  • Defendant Sicking Safety Systems, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Christopher J. Esbrook
    • Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
    • Brannon J Buck
  • Counter Claimant Dr. Dean Sicking
  • Represented By
    • Christopher J. Esbrook
    • Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
    • Brannon J Buck
  • Counter Defendant Marc Kapsalis
  • Represented By
    • Donald John Angelini, Jr.
    • Davis Shuford Vaughn
  • Counter Claimant Sicking Safety Systems, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Christopher J. Esbrook
    • Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
    • Brannon J Buck

Court Documents

19 #1

*Restricted*

Fees Apply
#28

(#28) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Marc Kapsalis.(Vaughn, Davis...

Fees Apply
#26

(#26) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsiv...

Fees Apply
#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Shuford Vaughn on behalf...

Fees Apply
#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward S Sledge, IV on behalf ...

Fees Apply
#23

(#23) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marc Kapsal...

Fees Apply
#22

(#22) INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Ju...

Fees Apply
#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B Driver on behalf...

Fees Apply
#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Brannon J Buck on behalf of Al...

Fees Apply
#19

(#19) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern...

Fees Apply
#18

(#18) TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Alabama the el...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • (#28) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Marc Kapsalis.(Vaughn, Davis) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#27) TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Hold a Rule 26(f) Conference. #26 . The Motion #26 is GRANTED. On or before July 8, 2019, Counterclaim Defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading. Additionally, on or before July 8, 2019, the parties SHALL conduct their Rule 26(f) conference. Thereafter, the parties SHALL file their report of the conference by July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/20/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#26) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and Hold a Rule 26(f) Conference by Dean Sicking, Sicking Safety Systems, Inc.. (Driver, Christopher) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Shuford Vaughn on behalf of Marc Kapsalis, Zikap, Inc. (Vaughn, Davis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward S Sledge, IV on behalf of Marc Kapsalis, Zikap, Inc. (Sledge, Edward) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#23) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marc Kapsalis by Sicking Safety Systems, Inc., Dean Sicking.(Buck, Brannon) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#22) INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/20/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B Driver on behalf of All Defendants (Driver, Christopher) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Brannon J Buck on behalf of All Defendants (Buck, Brannon) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#19) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01445. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/16/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#18) TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Alabama the electronic record. (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)
  • 05/15/2019
  • (#17) ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Dkt. No. #9 ) is granted in part and denied in part. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Defendants' request for dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/15/19. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)
  • 05/15/2019
  • (#16) ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer #9 is granted in part and denied in part. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith. The status hearing/ruling set for 5/22/19 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)
  • 04/18/2019
  • (#15) REPLY by Dean Sicking, Sicking Safety Systems, Inc. to response to motion, #14 (Esbrook, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)
  • 04/11/2019
  • (#14) RESPONSE by Marc Kapsalis, Zikap, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Sicking Safety Systems, Inc., Dean Sicking to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to transfer venue #9 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Angelini, Donald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)
  • 03/12/2019
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: MOTION by Defendants to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to transfer venue #9 is entered and briefed as follows: response by 4/11/19, reply by 4/18/19. Status hearing/ruling is set for 5/22/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is needed on 3/20/19. Mailed notice(maf) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)
  • 03/08/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #9 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kozlowski, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Marc Kapsalis, Zikap, Inc. by Donald John Angelini, Jr (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Angelini, Donald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM by Dean Sicking, Sicking Safety Systems, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kozlowski, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendants Sicking Safety Systems, Inc., Dean Sicking to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to transfer venue (Kozlowski, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.