This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2023 at 07:48:12 (UTC).

K A P Electric Inc v. X L Specialty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 K A P Electric Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against X L Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06194

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K A P Electric Inc

Defendant

X L Specialty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G Hodgkins

Katherine Belle Remy

Defendant Attorneys

Virginia Y Dodd

Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr

Kevin William Welsh

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against X L Specialty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5398036) filed by K A P Electric Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael G Hodgkins added to party K A P Electric Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Hodgkins, Michael) Modified docket text on 12/16/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #3

Additional Neutrals

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to X L Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K A P Electric Inc. (aty,Hodgkins, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by X L Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party X L Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Dodd, Virginia) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

5 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. X L Specialty Insurance Co answer due 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/18/2023. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Michael G Hodgkins on behalf of K A P Electric Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2023. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Virginia Y Dodd on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2023. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by X L Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/14/2023. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K A P Electric Inc. (aty,Hodgkins, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FILED IN ERROR. RESUBMITTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AT DOC #12 . CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K A P Electric Inc. (aty,Hodgkins, Michael) Modified on 2/1/2023 to reflect filed in error and resubmitted (Miletello, A). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/14/2023. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by X L Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Virginia Y Dodd on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2023. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Michael G Hodgkins on behalf of K A P Electric Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/13/2023. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. X L Specialty Insurance Co answer due 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 1/18/2023. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by X L Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Virginia Y Dodd added to party X L Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Dodd, Virginia) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K A P Electric Inc. (aty,Hodgkins, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to X L Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against X L Specialty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5398036) filed by K A P Electric Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael G Hodgkins added to party K A P Electric Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Hodgkins, Michael) Modified docket text on 12/16/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less