This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:26:47 (UTC).

Kantengwa v. Brackett et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Kantengwa filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Brackett. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12566

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prudence Kantengwa

Defendants

Christopher Brackett

Marcos Charles

Todd Lyons

Acting Secretary Chad Wolf

William P. Barr

Matthew T. Albence

Department of Homeland Security (DHS)

Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Joyce

Attorney at Joyce and Associates, P.C.

205 Portland Street, 3Rd Floor

Boston, MA 02114

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. The Court orders that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the New Hampshire and assigned civil case number 1:20-cv-00061. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred to to District of District of New Hampshire;. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. The Court orders that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8025349 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Prudence Kantengwa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to ICE Requesting Release, #2 Exhibit A - Letters Between Petitioner and ICE, #3 Exhibit B - Second Letter to ICE, #4 Exhibit B - ICEs Response, #5 Exhibit C - BIA Decision on Bond, #6 Exhibit D - Immigration Judges Decision on Custody Redetermination, #7 Exhibit E - Immigration Judges Decision on Custody Redetermination, #8 Exhibit F - BIAs First Merits Decision Excerpt, #9 Exhibit G - First Circuit Court Judgement, #10 Exhibit H - Immigration Judges Second Merits Decision Excerpt, #11 Exhibit H - Immigration Judges Third Merits Decision Excerpt, #12 Exhibit I - BIAs Third Merits Decision, #13 Exhibit J - DHS Objection to Custody Redetermination Hearing Excerpt, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Category Form, #16 Notice of Filing with Clerks Office)(Joyce, William) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.