This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2020 at 06:40:41 (UTC).

Kanipe et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Kanipe filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary S Kanipe

James Kanipe

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joe A King, Jr.

Attorney at Morris King & Hodge

200 Pratt Ave. Ne

Huntsville, AL 35801

David J Hodge

Attorney at Morris, King, & Hodge

200 Pratt Avenue

Huntsville, AL 35801

Defendant Attorney

Richard B North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough LLP (Atlanta)

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys David Hodge, Joe King, Jr., and Richard North, Jr., are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Joe King, Jr., and Richard North, Jr.) (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02735. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#6

(#6) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David J. Hodge on behalf of James Kanipe, Mary S Kanipe. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joe A. King, Jr. on behalf of James Kanipe, Mary S Kanipe. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX175258 filed by Mary S Kanipe, James Kanipe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination. (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys David Hodge, Joe King, Jr., and Richard North, Jr., are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Joe King, Jr., and Richard North, Jr.) (AMP) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02735. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred to the Eastern District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175253 as to Joe A King, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175252 as to David J Hodge. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Docket(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2735-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David J. Hodge on behalf of James Kanipe, Mary S Kanipe. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joe A. King, Jr. on behalf of James Kanipe, Mary S Kanipe. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX175258 filed by Mary S Kanipe, James Kanipe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.