This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 09:43:56 (UTC).

Kammer v. CET Incorporated

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Kammer filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against CET Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip P Simon and Joshua P Kolar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

Referral Judge

Joshua P Kolar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Kammer

Defendant

CET Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas M Werman

Attorney at Werman Salas PC

77 W Washington St Ste 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

David A Buls

Attorney at Krieg DeVault LLP - Mer/IN

8001 Broadway Ste 400

Merrillville, IN 46410

Nancy J Townsend

Attorney at Krieg DeVault LLP - Mer/IN

8001 Broadway Ste 400

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

9 #1

Exhibit A- Consent to Join

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/30/2021. (tc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Eugene Kammer of Filing of Consent Form of Lee Riddle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/14/2021. (tc) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Eugene Kammer of Filing of Consent to Join of Jeremiah Darling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Join)(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David A Buls on behalf of CET Incorporated (Buls, David) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CET Incorporated. CET Incorporated waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CET Incorporated. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy J Townsend on behalf of CET Incorporated (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CET Incorporated on 3/5/2021 by Eugene Kammer. Waiver of Service due by 4/5/2021. (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon added. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. (nae) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Counsel did not submit a Summons or Notice of Request for Waiver of Service. (nae) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket***NEW CASE*** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Werman on behalf of Eugene Kammer (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CET Incorporated( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4502585.), filed by Eugene Kammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy J Townsend

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Buls