This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:42:31 (UTC).

Kamara v. American Express

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Kamara filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Express. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard T Strand and Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04031

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

Referral Judge

Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duval Lenell Kamara

Wall Lake, IA 51466

Defendant

American Express

 

Court Documents

2 #4

*Restricted*

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Redacted Exhibits

#2

(#2) PRO SE COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against American Express, filed by Duval Lenell Kamara. Scheduling Report due by 10/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy)(NEF to Plf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #4 Unredacted Exhibits) (ksy). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#1

(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Duval Lenell Kamara. (ksy)(NEF to Plf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against American Express, filed by Duval Lenell Kamara. Scheduling Report due by 10/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy)(NEF to Plf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #4 Unredacted Exhibits) (ksy). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Duval Lenell Kamara. (ksy)(NEF to Plf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant