This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:40:57 (UTC).

KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC v. INGERSOLL et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC filed an Other lawsuit against INGERSOLL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80009

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC

Defendants

JOHNNY LYN INGERSOLL

LAND, SEA, AIR UNLIMITED, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Dietrich Miller

Attorney at Miller Law PLLC

222 U.S. Hwy 1, Ste. 208E

Tequesta, FL 33469

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to JOHNNY LYN INGERSOLL, LAND, SEA, AIR UNLIMITED, INC.. (cds) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit C

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE : ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave L. Brannon for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/15/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Dismissal

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12278924, filed by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#5

(#5) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020., Discovery due by 6/8/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/29/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020., Motions due by 6/29/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/3/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Dismissal) (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Dismissal) (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER. On February 14, 2020, the Court was informed by telephone that the Parties have reached a settlement. The Court congratulates the Parties on their amicable resolution of this matter. Consistent with the instructions set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order (DE #5 ), the Parties must file closing documents within ten (10) days of informing the court of their settlement, or by February 24, 2020. The court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement if requested to do so in the closing documents. The Parties are further advised that the Notice of Settlement does not operate as a stay of this litigation. Therefore, until a voluntary dismissal is filed, the Parties must comply with all litigation deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/19/2020. (gts) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020., Discovery due by 6/8/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/29/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020., Motions due by 6/29/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/3/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE : ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave L. Brannon for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to JOHNNY LYN INGERSOLL, LAND, SEA, AIR UNLIMITED, INC.. (cds) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12278924, filed by KAM YACHT SALES - FLORIDA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.