This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 08:13:34 (UTC).

Kali Uchis Touring Inc. v. VFLA Eventco, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Kali Uchis Touring Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VFLA Eventco, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07109

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kali Uchis Touring Inc.

Defendants

Doe 1 through Doe 10

VFLA Eventco, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

S Martin Keleti

Christopher L Rudd

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Bennett Weisburd

Harvey W Geller

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A-D

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

Exhibit C - VFLA Ownco, LLC

1 #3

Exhibit B - VFLA Eventco, LLC

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Geller iso Notice of Removal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #9 is GRANTED for failure to oppose. This action is dismissed, without prejudice, and the 9/25/2020 hearing and all other dates and deadlines are VACATED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. (Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Harvey W. Geller in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to VFLA Eventco, LLC answer now due 8/31/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC.(Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Doe 1 through Doe 10, inclusive VFLA Eventco, LLC., filed by plaintiff Kali Uchis Touring Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on August 7, 2020. (Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC, (Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. (Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV25961 Receipt No: ACACDC-27538983 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant VFLA Eventco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geller iso Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - VFLA Eventco, LLC, #4 Exhibit C - VFLA Ownco, LLC) (Attorney Harvey W Geller added to party VFLA Eventco, LLC(pty:dft))(Geller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less