This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 10:26:57 (UTC).

Kajeet, Inc. v. Viasat, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Kajeet, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Viasat, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00707

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kajeet, Inc.

Defendant

Viasat, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan T. Suder

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Michael Thomas Cooke

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke, P.C.

604 East 4Th St., Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Corby R. Vowell

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke

604 E. 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer A. Kash

Attorney at Warren Lex LLP

2261 Market Street, No. 606

San Francisco, CA 94114

B. Russell Horton

Attorney at George, Brothers, Kincaid & Horton, L.L.P.

114 West 7Th Street, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Erika Hart Warren

Attorney at Warren Lex LLP

2261 Market Street, No. 606

San Francisco, CA 94114

Matthew Warren

Attorney at Warren Lex LLP

2261 Market Street, No. 606

San Francisco, CA 94114-1600

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Kash. Attorney added for Viasat, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. Russell Horton for Jennifer Kash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15170811) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Viasat, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Richard A. Wojcio. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kajeet, Inc.. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kajeet, Inc.. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14989796), filed by Kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Kash. Attorney added for Viasat, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. Russell Horton for Jennifer Kash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15170811) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horton, B.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Viasat, Inc. answer due 8/30/2021. (ls) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant VIASAT, INC. is hereby granted an extension of time up to and including August 30, 2021, in which to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 08/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Viasat, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Richard A. Wojcio. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kajeet, Inc.. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kajeet, Inc.. (Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14989796), filed by Kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vowell, Corby) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kajeet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A Kash

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B. Russell Horton