This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 09:45:44 (UTC).

Kaiser v. Avco Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Kaiser filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Avco Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01288

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad E. Kaiser

Defendants

AVCO Corporation

Textron, Inc.

AGCO Corporation

Allied Products Corporation

ABC Corp. 1-5

New Idea Corporation

The Paul Revere Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle Ellsworth Rudderow

Attorney at Porter Nordby Howe LLP

125 East Jefferson Street, 11Th Floor

Syracuse, NY 13202

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Marie Robinson

Attorney at Goldberg, Segalla Law Firm - Syracuse Office

5786 Widewaters Parkway

Syracuse, NY 13214

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Notice and ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 10/22/20. (ban) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chad E. Kaiser (Rudderow, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/25/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/18/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVCO Corporation and Textron, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Textron, Inc. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Chad E. Kaiser in Tompkins County Supreme Court. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Certificate of Service

1 #11

Exhibit K - AGCO Corporation Consent to Removal

1 #10

Exhibit J - Certificate of Ownership and Merger of New Idea Corporation into Al

1 #9

Exhibit I - Allied Products Corporation Entity Details

1 #8

Exhibit H - Certificate of Good Standing of Allied Products Corporation

1 #6

Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service of AGCO Corporation

1 #5

Exhibit E - State Court Affidavit of Service on AVCO Corporation

1 #4

Exhibit D - Business Entity Summary of the Paul Revere Corporation

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service on The Paul Revere Corporation

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Affidavit of Service on Textron, Inc.

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tompkins County Supreme Court, case number EF2020-0497 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5284494) filed by Textron, Inc. and AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Affidavit of Service on Textron, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service on The Paul Revere Corporation, #4 Exhibit D - Business Entity Summary of the Paul Revere Corporation, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Affidavit of Service on AVCO Corporation, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service of AGCO Corporation, #7 Exhibit G - Certificate of Dissolution of The Paul Revere Corporation, #8 Exhibit H - Certificate of Good Standing of Allied Products Corporation, #9 Exhibit I - Allied Products Corporation Entity Details, #10 Exhibit J - Certificate of Ownership and Merger of New Idea Corporation into Allied Products Corporation, #11 Exhibit K - AGCO Corporation Consent to Removal, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice and ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 10/22/20. (ban) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chad E. Kaiser (Rudderow, Michelle) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for AVCO Corporation and Textron, Inc. answer due 10/26/2020. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/25/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/18/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVCO Corporation and Textron, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Textron, Inc. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Chad E. Kaiser in Tompkins County Supreme Court. (pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tompkins County Supreme Court, case number EF2020-0497 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5284494) filed by Textron, Inc. and AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Affidavit of Service on Textron, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - State Court Affidavit of Service on The Paul Revere Corporation, #4 Exhibit D - Business Entity Summary of the Paul Revere Corporation, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Affidavit of Service on AVCO Corporation, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service of AGCO Corporation, #7 Exhibit G - Certificate of Dissolution of The Paul Revere Corporation, #8 Exhibit H - Certificate of Good Standing of Allied Products Corporation, #9 Exhibit I - Allied Products Corporation Entity Details, #10 Exhibit J - Certificate of Ownership and Merger of New Idea Corporation into Allied Products Corporation, #11 Exhibit K - AGCO Corporation Consent to Removal, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AGCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXTRON, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Lycoming Engines is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant