This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 08:10:04 (UTC).

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc v. Merck & Company Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Merck Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Haywood S Gilliam, Jr and Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-05497

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.

Defendants

Merck & Company Inc.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA

Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corporation

Shering-Plough Corporation

Schering Corporation

MSP Singapore Company LLC

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Allen Sasse

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Diane A. Shrewsbury

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kent A. Gardiner

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Mark M. Supko

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue N W

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Jonathan Stock

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Christopher Dean Dusseault

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Samuel G. Liversidge

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Geoffrey T. Holtz

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

Steven A. Reed

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

16 #7

Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USALTD

16 #6

Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals LTD

16 #5

Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering-Plough Corporation

16 #4

Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering Corporation

16 #3

Waiver of Service of Summons - MSP Singapore Company LLC

16 #2

Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation

16 #1

Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck & Company, Inc.

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck & Company, Inc., #2 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons - MSP Singapore Company LLC, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering Corporation, #5 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering-Plough Corporation, #6 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals LTD, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USALTD)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 08/02/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#12

(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc... (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse on behalf of Plaintiff Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#8

(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric J. Stock representing Defendant Merck & Company Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric Stock on behalf of the Specially Appearing Merck Defendants ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16187799.) filed by Merck & Company Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck & Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc.,, Other Affiliate Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Other Affiliate Schering Corp., Other Affiliate Schering-Plough Corp., Other Affiliate MSP Singapore Co. LLC for Merck & Company Inc.. re #4 Notice of Appearance (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dean Dusseault , Samuel G. Liversidge, and Eric J. Stock on Behalf of Specially Appearing Merck Defendants (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA identifying Corporate Parent Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal, (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck & Company, Inc., #2 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons - MSP Singapore Company LLC, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering Corporation, #5 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering-Plough Corporation, #6 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals LTD, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USALTD)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 26, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 19, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-05497-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 08/02/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc... (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse on behalf of Plaintiff Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric J. Stock representing Defendant Merck & Company Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric Stock on behalf of the Specially Appearing Merck Defendants ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16187799.) filed by Merck & Company Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck & Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc.,, Other Affiliate Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Other Affiliate Schering Corp., Other Affiliate Schering-Plough Corp., Other Affiliate MSP Singapore Co. LLC for Merck & Company Inc.. re #4 Notice of Appearance (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dean Dusseault , Samuel G. Liversidge, and Eric J. Stock on Behalf of Specially Appearing Merck Defendants (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA identifying Corporate Parent Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal, (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey T. Holtz on Behalf of Specially Appearing Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-592508. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-16186480). Filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSP Singapore Co. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schering-Plough Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. is a litigant