This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 08:13:29 (UTC).

Kaine v. Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Kaine filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03242

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosalie Kaine

Defendant

Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Lampert

2847 S. Ingram Mill Rd., Ste. A-100

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Hammons, Jr.

Attorney at Ellis, Ellis, Hammons & Johnson, PC

2808 S. Ingram Mill, Ste A104

Springfield, MO 65804

Eric Ryan Olson

Attorney at Ellis, Ellis, Hammons & Johnson, PC

2808 S. Ingram Mill, Ste A104

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE of appearance by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield (Attorney John D. Hammons, Jr added to party Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield(pty:dft))(Hammons, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield. Waiver sent to Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Hammons, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Eric Ryan Olson on behalf of Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield (Attorney Eric Ryan Olson added to party Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield(pty:dft))(Olson, Eric Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Eric Ryan Olson on behalf of Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield (Attorney Eric Ryan Olson added to party Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield(pty:dft))(Olson, Eric Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield. Waiver sent to Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Hammons, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of appearance by John D. Hammons, Jr on behalf of Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield (Attorney John D. Hammons, Jr added to party Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield(pty:dft))(Hammons, John) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Select Specialty Hospital - Springfield filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of Rosalie Kaine. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7588667. Service due by 12/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Specialty Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric R. Olson