This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2020 at 07:34:01 (UTC).

Kahannah Disaster Solutions, LLC v. G & B Roofing,Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2020 Kahannah Disaster Solutions, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against G B Roofing,Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller, Curtis V. Gomez and Robert A. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judges

Curtis V. Gomez

Robert A. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kahannah Disaster Solutions, LLC

5143 Palm Passage, Suite B28/29, P. O. Box 6135

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Defendant

G & B Roofing,Inc.

167 W. Ranch Ln.

Weatherford, TX 76088-3346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard H. Dollison

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard H. Dollison PC

5143 Palm Passage, Suite B28/29

St Thomas, VI 00802

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER (WAL) REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert A. Molloy for all further proceedings. District Judge Curtis V. Gomez no longer assigned to case. dated 4/27/2020 (MA) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to G & B Roofing,Inc.. (KAB) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

1 #5

Summons - G & B - Tiffany A. Arterbury, as Registered Agent

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Default Notice Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B - Executed Consent Judgment

1 #1

Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against G & B Roofing,Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-849061.)filed by Kahannah Disaster Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Consent Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Default Notice Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - G & B - Tiffany A. Arterbury, as Registered Agent) (Dollison, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (WAL) REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert A. Molloy for all further proceedings. District Judge Curtis V. Gomez no longer assigned to case. dated 4/27/2020 (MA) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to G & B Roofing,Inc.. (KAB) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against G & B Roofing,Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-849061.)filed by Kahannah Disaster Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Consent Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Default Notice Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - G & B - Tiffany A. Arterbury, as Registered Agent) (Dollison, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less