This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 09:58:12 (UTC).

Kading et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Kading filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01196

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Kading

Joan Kading

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Blakely, Jr.

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

3391 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

N. Kirkland Pope

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

3391 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/10/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Technology Inc by Joan Kading, Eric Kading. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Technology Inc by Joan Kading, Eric Kading. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/10/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology Inc filed by Joan Kading, Eric Kading. Fee $402. Receipt Number LIT084838. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Joseph Blakely, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer N. Kirkland Pope