Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2021 at 08:30:50 (UTC).

Kadin v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Kadin filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21511

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel S. Kadin

Defendants

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adrian Gucovschi

Attorney at Gucovschi Law, PLLC

630 Fifth Avenue Suite 2000

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Dismissing Consol Plaintiff Daniel S. Kadin from this action without prejudice re ( #7 in case 1:21-cv-21511-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/20/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/13/2021) (sjo) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robinhood Financials LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) Modified on 3/26/2021 (sj). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24305154)Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per DE #12 Order. Closing Case and Association terminated. (mc) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Dismissing Consol Plaintiff Daniel S. Kadin from this action without prejudice re ( #7 in case 1:21-cv-21511-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/20/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#11) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-02566 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21511-CMA on 4/20/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02566. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 4/13/2021) (sjo) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adrian Gucovschi to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; typographical error with case number. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adrian Gucovschi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robinhood Financial, LLC; Robinhood Securities, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robinhood Financials LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) Modified on 3/26/2021 (sj). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24305154)Document filed by Daniel S. Kadin..(Gucovschi, Adrian) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant