This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 08:02:02 (UTC).

Kaddouh et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Kaddouh filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-61227

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mohammed Ali Kaddouh

Nour Alhajji Houssein

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States department of state

Secretary of The Department of Homeland Security

Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States Secretary of State

Ambassador of the United States at the U.S. Embassy, Lebanon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence A. Hashish

307, 1700 East Las Olas Blvd.

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance (Noticing INS Attorney) added for defendants. (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (swr) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15749109, filed by Nour Alhajji Houssein, Mohammed Ali Kaddouh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Hashish, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant