This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 10:31:39 (UTC).

Kackley v. Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Kackley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bret Kackley

Defendant

Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen L. Mowry

Attorney at Von Erdmannsdorff, Mowry & Bartlett

5600 North Antioch Road

Kansas City, MO 64119

Eric Eugene Bartlett

Attorney at Von Erdmannsdorff, Mowry & Bartlett

5600 North Antioch Road

Kansas City, MO 64119

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn M. O'Shea

Attorney at Wallace, Saunders, Austin, Brown & Enochs, Chtd

10111 W. 87Th St.

Overland Park, KS 66212

Kevin D Weakley

Attorney at Wallace Saunders-KCMO

200 Ne Missouri Road, Suite 224

Lee'S Summit, MO 64086

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2021. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 4/7/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 4/14/2022 09:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 09:00 AM (for 3 days) in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company filed by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Eric Eugene Bartlett on behalf of Plaintiff Bret Kackley.(Bartlett, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#11

(#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Robert Schieber(Bartlett, Eric) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/24/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/10/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 4/7/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/10/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

7 #1

MAP General Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attorney Kathryn M. O'Shea added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#5

(#5) DESIGNATION as Lead Trial Counsel by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kevin D Weakley on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

1 #2

State Court Petition State Court Records

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV26668, filed by Kevin D Weakley on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7274876. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition State Court Records)(Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2021. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 4/7/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 4/14/2022 09:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 09:00 AM (for 3 days) in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 4/7/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Eric Bartlett. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Kevin Weakley. Time in court: 10:33 a.m. to 10:38 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company filed by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Eric Eugene Bartlett on behalf of Plaintiff Bret Kackley.(Bartlett, Eric) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Robert Schieber(Bartlett, Eric) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/24/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/10/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 4/7/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/10/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attorney Kathryn M. O'Shea added to party Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DESIGNATION as Lead Trial Counsel by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kevin D Weakley on behalf of Defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION of Place of Trial (Kansas City) by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV26668, filed by Kevin D Weakley on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7274876. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition State Court Records)(Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant